Buompadre, Maria Celeste (CPSO#: 105545)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Cordoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Mar 2015 to 23 May 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2015 to 25 Feb 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Feb 2016