Burgess, George Henry (CPSO#: 11708)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 1945

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1945
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2001