Burgess, Kenneth Gordon (CPSO#: 30172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lower Level
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone: (905) 547-2302
Fax: (905) 548-9722
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Burgess Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Burgess ( CPSO# 30172 )

Business Address:
Lower Level
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone Number: (905) 547-2302

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH GORDON BURGESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGESS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1978