Burget, Nancy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 56932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
132 -1835 Gordon Road
Kelowna BC  V1Y 3H5
Phone: (250) 717-3211
Fax: (250) 717-3233
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. E. Burget Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ELIZABETH BURGET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1987