Burggraf, Gary Winston (CPSO#: 26412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Home Cardiographics, Jeanne Mance 3
166 Brock street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 546-1451
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY WINSTON BURGGRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGGRAF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1974