Burgman, William Richards (CPSO#: 30148)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 1995