Burhan, Amer Mohammed Abdul-Latif (CPSO#: 76957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute; Mental Health
Geriatric Psychiatry Program
Suite F2-349
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47326
Fax: (519) 455-7151
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Burhan ( CPSO# 76957 )

Business Address:
Geriatric Psychiatry Program
Suite F2-342
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 455-5110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMER MOHAMMED ABDUL-LATIF BURHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003