Burjorjee, Jessica Elizabeth (CPSO#: 73521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Elizabeth Burjorjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Victory 2
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Mental Health Services
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA ELIZABETH BURJORJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURJORJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2005