Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Burk-Vassallo, Jane Lorraine (CPSO#: 61322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Names: Vassallo, Jane Lorraine (used until: 09 Oct 2012 )     Burk, Jane Lorraine (used until: 21 Oct 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Fourth Avenue
Suite 30
St Catharines ON  L2S 3P1
Phone: (905) 397-1122
Fax: (905) 397-5337
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2-352 Wilson St.E
Ancaster ON  L9G2C2
Canada
Phone: 905-648-0546
Fax: 905-648-0544
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane L. Burk-Vassallo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Burk-Vassallo ( CPSO# 61322 )

Business Address:
2 - 352 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C2
Phone Number: (905) 648-0546

Business Address:
30 - 100 4th Avenue
Ridley Heights Plaza
St Catharines ON  L2S 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 397-1122

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE LORRAINE BURK-VASSALLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURK-VASSALLO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990