Burke, Bonnie Ann (CPSO#: 67933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647) 367-5190
Fax: (416) 519-7816
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

465 Garyray Drive
Toronto ON  M9L 1P9
Canada
Phone: 4167499300
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Burke ( CPSO# 67933 )

Business Address:
25 Morton Shumar Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone Number: (647) 367-5190

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BONNIE ANN BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999