Burke, Bradley David (CPSO#: 81958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 52009
Windsor ON  N8X 0A1
Phone: (888) 501-9188
Electoral District: 01

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Windsor Regional Hospital - Tayfour Campus 1453 Prince Road Windsor, Ontario N9C 3Z4 Tel: (519) 257-5184 Fax:(519) 257-5137
Date Received: 09 Aug 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 26 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY DAVID BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2007