Burke, Bruce Reginald (CPSO#: 33326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. R. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE REGINALD BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982