Burke, Don Gilbert (CPSO#: 63407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Abbotsford Regional Hospital
and Cancer Centre ICU
32900 Marshall Road
Abbotsford BC  V2S 0C2
Phone: (604) 851-4811
Fax: (604) 851-4812
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Don G. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Burke ( CPSO# 63407 )

Business Address:
32900 Marshall Road
Abbotsford BC  V2S 0C2
Phone Number: (604) 861-4811

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-2200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DON GILBERT BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1991