Burke, Emory (CPSO#: 20895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1967


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6064
Fax: (416) 486-8425
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emory Burke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2003

Dr. E. Burke ( CPSO# 20895 )

Business Address:
Cardio-Pulmonary Lab
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6064

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 12 Nov 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 13 Mar 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. EMORY BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1967