Burke, Howard Mitchell (CPSO#: 59437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-0323
Fax: (905) 697-0230
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert Burke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Burke ( CPSO# 59437 )
Dr. M. Albert ( CPSO# 59769 )

Business Address:
1450 King Street
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 721-4946

Business Address:
Suite 2100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-0323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD MITCHELL BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1989