Burkes, Ronald Louis (CPSO#: 31453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
1221 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5117
Fax: (416) 586-3228
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5117
Fax: (416) 586-3228
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronald Burkes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Burkes ( CPSO# 31453 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
1221 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5117

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Cancer Centre
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD LOUIS BURKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1985