Burkhardt, Renate Maria (CPSO#: 23069)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Hamburg University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jul 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Mar 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1999