Burkhart, Aaron Raymond (CPSO#: 97704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. R. Burkhart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Burkhart ( CPSO# 97704 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON RAYMOND BURKHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKHART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017