Burkholder, Joseph Norman (CPSO#: 14256)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994