Burlacoff, Susan Gayle (CPSO#: 43878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 31 Jul 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Jun 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Jun 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Burlacoff has ceased to practice medicine.