Burman, Mark Lewis (CPSO#: 72171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montreal General Hospital
Suite B5.159-1
1650 Cedar Avenue
Montreal QC  H3G 1A4
Phone: (514) 934-1934
Fax: (514) 934-8283

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Oklahoma

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK LEWIS BURMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1998