Burn, Paul Richard (CPSO#: 75387)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cambridge, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 May 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2003