Burnell, Margot Joy (CPSO#: 32763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Oncology
Saint John Regional Hospital
P O Box 2100
Saint John NB  E2L 4L2
Phone: (506) 648-6884
Fax: (506) 648-6880

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGOT JOY BURNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1981