Burnett, Judith Caroline Struan (CPSO#: 54379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: Tough, Judith Caroline Struan (used until: 15 Apr 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Ext. 2168
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH CAROLINE STRUAN BURNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1988