Burnett, Robert Stephen James (CPSO#: 70800)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 104 3551 Blanshard St Victoria, BC V8Z 0B9
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Missouri

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017