Burns, Brenda Ruth (CPSO#: 84636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5022
Fax: (705) 876-5075
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6 McPherson St
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 286-2140
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Burns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Burns ( CPSO# 84636 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA RUTH BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008