Burns, Daniel James Patrick (CPSO#: 95270)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017