Burns, David Erin (CPSO#: 50230)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1978 to 14 Jun 1979
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004