Burns, Emma Caroline MacLeod (CPSO#: 88311)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2008 to 27 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011