Burns, Gerard Michael (CPSO#: 20497)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 28 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Active Care Medical Centre 1108 Klondike Road Kanata ON K2K 0G1 Phone: (613)-254-9777 Fax: (613)-254-9778
Date Received: 28 Oct 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jan 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 2014