Burns, Karen Elizabeth Ann (CPSO#: 67849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
4045 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3567
Fax: (416) 864-5210
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen E. A. Burns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Burns ( CPSO# 67849 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
4-045 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH ANN BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2001