Burns, Karen Lynn Mary (CPSO#: 59593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Pathology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-424 Ext. 2286
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LYNN MARY BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1989