Burns, Kevin Donald (CPSO#: 54263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Room 535A
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82580
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin D. Burns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Burns ( CPSO# 54263 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Suite 535
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN DONALD BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1988