Burns, Timothy James Robert (CPSO#: 28287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
460 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 6H9
Phone: (519) 637-9879
Fax: (519) 631-6143
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy J. Burns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Burns ( CPSO# 28287 )

Business Address:
103 - 460 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 6H9
Phone Number: (519) 637-9879

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JAMES ROBERT BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2000