Burnstein, Marcus Jeffrey (CPSO#: 50232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 - 046
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6050
Fax: 416-864-5668
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Burnstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Burnstein ( CPSO# 50232 )

Business Address:
16-046 - 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS JEFFREY BURNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1992