Burpee, Stephen Edward (CPSO#: 62139)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2006