Burra, Prakash (CPSO#: 23289)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 596 Heritage Court, Kingston, ON K7M 9C9
Date Received: 06 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015