Burra, Tara Allison Raja (CPSO#: 84637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6486 Ext. 3801
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Burra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Burra ( CPSO# 84637 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA ALLISON RAJA BURRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 May 2009 to 15 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 May 2010 to 14 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 15 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012