Burrell, Althea Alexina (CPSO#: 86706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: Barthos, Althea Alexina (used until: 14 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Country Glen Medical Clinic
Markham ON  L6B 1E8
Phone: (905) 554-4001
Fax: (905) 554-4002
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

G7-377 Church Street
Medical Office Building
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7614
Fax: 905-472-7618
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALTHEA ALEXINA BURRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURRELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2012