Burrell, John Charles (CPSO#: 29732)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 215 North 2300 East Layton UT 84040 United States
Date Received: 05 Jul 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
USA - Utah

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2016