Burrow, Sarah Rogers (CPSO#: 63911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Center
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
1200 Main Street West 4E
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73177
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ROGERS BURROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURROW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1992