Burrows, Gary Tait (CPSO#: 50234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY TAIT BURROWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURROWS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995