Burrows, John Frederick (CPSO#: 18237)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Oct 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993