Burstein, Lili Miriam (CPSO#: 56889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: Waithorn-Burstein, Lili Miriam (used until: 02 Dec 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15017 Yonge Street
Suite 200
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 727-9481
Fax: (905) 727-6280
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lili Burstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Burstein ( CPSO# 56889 )

Business Address:
200 - 15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone Number: (905) 727-9481

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILI MIRIAM BURSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1987