Burton, Jodie Melissa (CPSO#: 74736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Foothills Medical Centre
1403 29th St NW
Calgary AB  T2N 2T9
Phone: 403 210-6614

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODIE MELISSA BURTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 03 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005