Burton, Stephen Richard (CPSO#: 55977)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2003