Burute, Nishigandha Prabhakar (CPSO#: 101344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2024

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Pune, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burute Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Burute ( CPSO# 101344)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Center
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone Number: (807) 223-8200

Business Address:
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon ON  P0T 2J0
Phone Number: (807) 887-3026

Business Address:
20B Cartier Road
Box 370
Terrace Bay ON  P0T 2W0
Phone Number: (807) 825-3273

Business Address:
26 Peninsula Road
Box 780
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-1740

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Nishigandha Prabhakar Burute may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic Imaging, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario
                        School   of  Medicine,  in  which  Dr.  Burute  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Burute  no  longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Burute's clinical
                        performance,  knowledge,  skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive  an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Burute's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  1,  2017.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs  2  and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2024.