Bury, Katherine Diane (CPSO#: 18681)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 06 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Bury indicated that all of her patient files are in the custody of the clinic where the patient received care.
Date Received: 22 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2013