Burzynski, Jeffrey Hammond (CPSO#: 77128)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2001 to 14 Dec 2001
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2004