Bush, Haydn (CPSO#: 42396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
240 Wharncliffe Road
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone: (519) 204-4704
Fax: (519) 204-4708
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

32 Canadian Forces HSC
Detachment London
701 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 4T7
Canada
Phone: (519) 660-5275 Ext. 5199
Fax: (519) 660-5357
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 20 Mar 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAYDN BUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2000